Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Uncompensated Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0445 (SB0630)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1215/CH0445)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1215 /CH0445 (SB0630) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1215/CH0445) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Senator Madaleno 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM
Click to return on the top page