Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Employment Assistance for Veterans
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0696 Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2015 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 Department of Veterans Affairs - Employment Assistance for Veterans Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page