Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Uniform Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0522/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0302 (HB0564)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0564 (SB0522/CH0302) Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0522 /CH0302 (HB0564) Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page