Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0444)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0453)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0453 (SB0444) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
SB0444 (HB0453) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0545 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page