Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Wetlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 (SB0028)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0588)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773
Title
Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 (SB0042)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0302)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042 (HB0874)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB0481)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 /CH0124
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0302 (SB0028) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0481 (SB0588) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 (SB0042) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 (HB0302) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0036 Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0042 (HB0874) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 (HB0481) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal President 3 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 /CH0124 Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Revisions Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page