Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/24/2024 9:11:56 PM
Tuesday, April 2, 2024
Senate
Created: 3/19/2024 4:39 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
House bills are sponsor only unless there is opposition. If there is opposition, the Committee will hear from a limited number of proponents and a limited number of opponents. Below each bill is indication of whether it will be a sponsor only or limited witness hearing.
Sen Guzzone

Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries - Reporting Requirements
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents
(Added - 3/27/2024 3:06 PM)
Sen Hershey

Real Estate Brokers - Commercial Transactions - Buyer's Rights
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents
(Added - 3/26/2024 8:27 AM)
Sen McCray (BCA)

Baltimore Regional Water Authority Governance Workgroup - Established
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents
(Added - 3/29/2024 11:55 AM)
Sen Carter (BCA)

Natural Resources - Establishment of Gwynns Falls State Park
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 4/1/2024 5:27 PM)
Del Patterson

Charles County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Timing and Video Streaming and Archiving
Sponsor only testimony
Del Harrison

Public Schools - Student Health - Information on Accessible Dental Health
Sponsor only testimony
Dels Williams and Wilkins

Election Law - Curbside Voting
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/27/2024 10:25 AM)
Calvert County Delegation

Calvert County - Ethics - Conflict of Interest and Commissioner Expulsion
Sponsor only testimony
Frederick County Delegation

Boundary of the Frederick County Soil Conservation District - Alteration
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/22/2024 2:05 PM)
Del Guyton, et al

State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/22/2024 2:05 PM)
Del Allen

Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Construction Permits - Conditions for Exemption
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/22/2024 2:05 PM)
Howard County Delegation

Howard County Agricultural Preservation Advisory Board - Term Length - Alteration Ho. Co. 15-24
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/22/2024 2:05 PM)
Del Ruff, et al

Natural Resources - Gwynns Falls State Park - Focus Group, Advisory Committee, and Report
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/22/2024 2:05 PM)
Dorchester County Delegation

Dorchester County - Definition of Public School Employee - Alteration
Sponsor only testimony
Dels Adams and Hutchinson

Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/22/2024 2:05 PM)
Del S. Johnson, et al

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents
Del Conaway, et al

Education - Public Middle Schools - Instructive Program on Collateral Consequences of a Criminal Conviction
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents
Dels Smith and Toles

Nonpublic Schools – Transcripts – Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents
Del Rose, et al

Public Schools - Mathematics Credit - College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
Limited oral testimony - Three proponents and three opponents

Created: 4/2/2024 1:41 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
3:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page