Day(s)
As of: 9/19/2024 7:34:56 PM
Created: 8/2/2021 4:27 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
The Subcommittee is invited to participate in the House Education and Economic Development Subcommittee briefing on the following topic:
- Institutions of Higher Education Fall Semester Operations
Created: 7/20/2021 11:13 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Institutions of Higher Education Fall Semester Operations
(Added - 9/8/2021 1:06 PM)
Discuss topics related to financial education and expanding capability.
Update on Housing Relief Programs and Evictions
Created: 8/30/2021 10:30 AM
1:00 PM to 2:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
12:30 PM to 2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 7/20/2021 4:18 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Regularly Scheduled Meeting
Created: 8/17/2021 7:19 AM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.