Day(s)
As of: 4/26/2024 3:40:25 PM
Created: 9/10/2021 4:43 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
1:00 PM - Site Visit
Morgan State University
1600 Haven Road
Baltimore, MD 21251
1600 Haven Road
Baltimore, MD 21251
Canceled
Health and Social Services Subcommittee
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 9/9/2021 9:42 AM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee
2:00 PM - Site Visit
Tour of Marian House
949 Gorusch Ave.
Baltimore, MD 21218
949 Gorusch Ave.
Baltimore, MD 21218
Additional presentations at the site by Baltimore Crisis Response, Inc., Behavioral Health System Maryland, and Serving Together.
Canceled
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Created: 9/9/2021 9:38 AM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
2:00 PM - Site Visit
Tour of Port of Baltimore
2001 Broening Highway
Baltimore, MD 21224
2001 Broening Highway
Baltimore, MD 21224
Created: 7/9/2021 1:29 PM
5:30 PM
-
Maryland Judicial Center, 187 Harry S. Truman Pkwy., Annapolis, MD 21401
5:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.
Created: 8/30/2021 8:56 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Public Hearing
Re: Emergency Regulations: DLS Control No. 21-110E
State Board of Education: State School Administration
Educational Equity: COMAR 13A.01.06.01 through .04
Created: 7/27/2021 8:24 AM
Thursday, September 16, 2021
10:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health
Introduction and Presentation by Nancy Brown, Division Chief of Evaluation, Research, and Data Analytics, Maryland Medicaid Office of Innovation, Research, and Development.
(Added - 9/10/2021 11:57 AM)
Created: 9/7/2021 10:08 AM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 6751 Columbia Gateway Dr., Columbia, MD
Overview of Workgroup Purposes and Objectives.