Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 11/30/2021 5:47:59 AM
Tuesday, October 5, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Created: 8/10/2021 1:07 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Pipeline to Homelessness; Housing as a Driver of Health

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/17/2021 4:44 PM
3:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
3:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Statewide Redistricting Hearing
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Materials
Meeting Guidelines
Legislative Redisticting

State Park Investment Commission
Created: 9/24/2021 9:51 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Community Stakeholders' Session

Click to return on the top page