Day(s)
As of: 9/19/2024 3:52:35 PM
Created: 8/17/2021 4:24 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting
Created: 9/23/2021 2:29 PM
9:30 AM to 11:30 AM - Frostburg State University, Room 397, Gira Building
Phone Link: 440-688-1212
PIN 241 846 882#
Note for in-person attendees: Masks are required and attendees must check in first using this link
PIN 241 846 882#
Note for in-person attendees: Masks are required and attendees must check in first using this link
Discuss recommendations for upcoming legislative session and final report.
Briefings on long-term care issues affecting families.
Created: 9/24/2021 1:20 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID 915 9970 4726 Passcode: 164764
Dial-in Number: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 915 9970 4726 Passcode: 164764
Meeting ID 915 9970 4726 Passcode: 164764
Dial-in Number: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 915 9970 4726 Passcode: 164764
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 9/28/2021 4:41 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Open Meeting of the Full Authority + Closed Executive Session