1.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 1998 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/1998rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 1998 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 72 HB 113 Status as of May 21, 1998: Vetoed by the Governor - Cross-filed bill ...
|
2.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 1999 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/1999rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 1999 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 69 HB 45 Status as of April 27, 1999: Became Law - Chapter 202 Passed ...
|
3.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2000 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2000rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2000 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 85 HB 108 Status as of May 19, 2000: Vetoed by the Governor - Cross-filed bill ...
|
4.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2001 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2001rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2001 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 102 HB 99 Status as of March 13, 2001: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn ...
|
5.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2002 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2002rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2002 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 83 HB 141 Status as of April 6, 2002: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable ...
|
6.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2003 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2003rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2003 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 102 HB 47 Status as of January 20, 2003: Bill is in the House - First Reading ...
|
7.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2004 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2004rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2004 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 136 HB 107 Status as of March 15, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable ...
|
8.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2004 1st Special Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2004s1/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2004 Special Session 1 Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 1 HB 2 Status as of January 10, 2005: Veto Governor Veto Sponsored By The ...
|
9.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2005 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2005rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2005 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 133 HB 81 Status as of March 14, 2005: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn ...
|
10.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2006 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2006rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2006 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 144 HB 107 Status as of March 24, 2006: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable ...
|
11.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2006 1st Special Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2006s1/sponsors/Morhaim.htm 2006 Special Session 1 Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 2 HB 2 Status as of June 22, 2006: Became Law - Chapter 4 Became Law - ...
|
12.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2010 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2010rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2010 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 124 HB 143 Status as of February 22, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable ...
|
13.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2012 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2012rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2012 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 73 HB 71 Status as of May 22, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 484 Became Law - ...
|
14.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2007 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2007RS/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2007 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 139 HB 27 Status as of April 9, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable ...
|
15.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2008 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2008rs/sponsors/Morhaim.htm 2008 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 130 HB 142 Status as of April 24, 2008: Became Law - Chapter 253 Became Law - ...
|
16.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2009 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2009rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2009 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 95 HB 70 Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 656 Became Law - ...
|
17.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2011 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2011rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2011 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 79 HB 48 Status as of April 8, 2011: Bill is in the Senate - Refuses to Recede ...
|
18.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY-MORHAIM-1996 REGULAR SESSION https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/1996rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 1996 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 47 HB 78 Status as of April 30, 1996: Became Law - Chapter 180 Thumbs Up ...
|
19.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2007 1st Special Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2007s1/sponsors/Morhaim.htm 2007 Special Session 1 Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 2 HB 31 Status as of November 12, 2007: Bill is in the House - Re-referred ...
|
20.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY- MORHAIM - 2012 1st Special Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2012s1/sponsors/morhaim.htm 2012 Special Session 1 Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 2 Co-sponsored Bills HB 1808 Status as of May 14, 2012: Bill is in the House ...
|
21.
|
BILLS SPONSORED BY-MORHAIM-1997 Regular Session https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/1997rs/sponsors/morhaim.htm 1997 Regular Session Delegate Dan K. Morhaim District 11 Status of Legislation Total Number of Bills: 67 HB 321 Status as of March 18, 1997: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable ...
|