Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 28
Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 114
Status as of March 24, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 391
Status as of April 9, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations
Status as of March 7, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Status as of March 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations
Status as of March 12, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of March 30, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 446
Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 318
Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 180
Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 478
Status as of March 19, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Judicial Proceedings
Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 113
Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 317
Status as of February 7, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of April 3, 2007: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Health and Government Operations
Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 551
Status as of February 14, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Finance
Status as of March 30, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation
Status as of February 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance
Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 179
Status as of February 21, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Finance
Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 368