Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 8
Status as of May 22, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 487
Status as of March 29, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of March 22, 2012: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations
Status as of March 21, 2012: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Economic Matters
Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 185
Status as of May 22, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 486
Status as of April 6, 2012: Bill is in the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
Status as of March 23, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Finance