Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


1998 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 149

CHAPTER NUMBER: 778 File Code: Public Health
Sponsored By:
Delegates Morhaim and Nathan-Pulliam
Entitled:
Task Force to Study Increasing the Availability of Substance Abuse Programs

Synopsis:

Establishing a Task Force to Study Increasing the Availability of Substance Abuse Programs; providing for the membership, duties, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring a specified report on or before January 1, 2000; requiring the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration to find a specified location for a specified substance abuse program; and providing for the termination of the Act.

History by Legislative Date

House Action
1/19
First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/9

Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/10
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/13
Third Reading Passed (129-5)
4/10
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Passed Enrolled
5/21
Signed by the Governor Chapter 778
Senate Action
2/16
First Reading Finance
2/19
Re-assigned Economic and Environmental Affairs
3/11
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic and Environmental Affairs
4/10
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/11
Special Order 4/13 (Senator Della) Adopted
4/12
Floor Amendment (Senator Della) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Sponsored by:
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Bill indexed under the following Subjects:
ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCIES
BOATS AND SHIPS
COMMITTEES AND COMMISSIONS -see also- POLITICAL COMMITTEES
CONTROLLED DANGEROUS SUBSTANCES -see also- DRUGS
DRUGS -see also- CONTROLLED DANG SUB; DRUNK & DRUGGED DRIVG.
HEALTH -see also- MENTAL HEALTH
REPORTS -see also- RECORDS
SUNSET
WOMEN
Bill affects the following Statutes:
Article - 41 Governor - Executive and Administrative Departments
( 18-316 )
Health - General
( 8-901 )

Documents:

Bill Text: First Reading (pdf), Third Reading (pdf), enrolled (pdf)
Fiscal Note: Available (pdf)
Amendments:
House
Number: 339080/1 (pdf)     Offered on: February 10, 1998   at: 10:40 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 233106/1 (pdf)     Offered on: April 13, 1998   at: 1:36 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 354116/1 (pdf)     Offered on: April 10, 1998   at: 12:20 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 13, 1998: Third Reading Passed (129-5)
April 10, 1998: Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Senate
April 12, 1998: Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Click to return on the top page