Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2005 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1284

File Code: Private Sector Labor and Industry Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 790
Sponsored By:
Delegates Healey, Barkley, Benson, Bobo, Boschert, Bronrott, Cane, Carter, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conroy, Cryor, C. Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Dumais, Feldman, Franchot, Frush, Gaines, Gilleland, Goldwater, Goodwin, Gutierrez, Haynes, Heller, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, Kaiser, Kelley, King, Kirk, Krysiak, Lee, Love, Madaleno, Malone, Mandel, Marriott, McHale, McIntosh, Menes, Moe, Murray, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Paige, Parker, Patterson, Pendergrass, Quinter, Ramirez, Rosenberg, Ross, Rudolph, Taylor, V. Turner, Vaughn, Hurson, and Kullen
Entitled:
Fair Share Health Care Fund Act

Synopsis:

Establishing the Fair Share Health Care Fund; establishing the purpose of the Fund; providing that the Fund consists of specified payments made by employers in connection with a specified health care payroll assessment; providing that the Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; requiring that investment earnings of the Fund be retained in the Fund; requiring the interest on and other income from the Fund be separately accounted for; etc.

History by Legislative Date

House Action
2/11
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/23
Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order 3/24 (Delegate Arnick) Adopted
3/23
Special Order after Third Reading calendar (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (48-80)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Moe) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) Rejected
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate McHale) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (39-90)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/24
Third Reading Passed (84-50)
4/8
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (84-50)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/28
First Reading Finance & Budget and Taxation
3/29
Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/7
Floor Amendment (Senator Stoltzfus)
Special Order until evening session (Senator Stoltzfus) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Stoltzfus) Rejected (18-28)
Floor Amendment (Senator Stoltzfus) Rejected (20-27)
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-17)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Governor vetoed - Policy
 
1/11/2006
House - Motion Special Order until 1/12 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
1/12/2006
House - Motion override the Governors veto
House - Veto overridden (88-50)
 
1/13/2006
Senate - Motion Special Order until 1/17 (Senator McFadden) Adopted
1/17/2006
Senate - Motion override the Governors veto
Senate - Veto overridden (30-17)
 
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Ch 3 of 2006 Session

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Charles Barkley, District 39
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate David G. Boschert, District 33A
Delegate William A. Bronrott, District 16
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Jill P. Carter, District 41
Delegate Virginia P. Clagett, District 30
Delegate Galen R. Clagett, District 3A
Delegate Mary A. Conroy, District 23A
Delegate Jean B. Cryor, District 15
Delegate Clarence Davis, District 45
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Ann Marie Doory, District 43
Delegate Kathleen M. Dumais, District 15
Delegate Brian J. Feldman, District 15
Delegate Peter Franchot, District 20
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Terry R. Gilleland, Jr., District 32
Delegate Marilyn R. Goldwater, District 16
Delegate Marshall T. Goodwin, District 40
Delegate Ana Sol Gutierrez, District 18
Delegate Keith E. Haynes, District 44
Delegate Henry B. Heller, District 19
Delegate Sheila E. Hixson, District 20
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., District 23B
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate John Adams Hurson, District 18
Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate Darryl A. Kelley, District 26
Delegate Nancy J. King, District 39
Delegate Ruth M. Kirk, District 44
Delegate Carolyn J. Krysiak, District 46
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Delegate James E. Malone, Jr., District 12A
Delegate Adrienne A. Mandel, District 19
Delegate Salima Siler Marriott, District 40
Delegate Brian K. McHale, District 46
Delegate Maggie McIntosh, District 43
Delegate Pauline H. Menes, District 21
Delegate Brian R. Moe, District 21
Delegate Gareth E. Murray, District 20
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Jeffrey A. Paige, District 44
Delegate Rosetta C. Parker, District 47
Delegate Obie Patterson, District 26
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Neil F. Quinter, District 13
Delegate Victor R. Ramirez, District 47
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate David D. Rudolph, District 34B
Delegate Herman L. Taylor, Jr., District 14
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

HEALTH -see also- MENTAL HEALTH
HEALTH INSURANCE -see also- HMOS; MANAGED CARE ORGANIZATIONS
LABOR, LICENSING, AND REGULATION, DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATIONS
PENALTIES
REPORTS
REVENUE AND TAXES -see also- DEV FEES & TAXES; specific tax.
RULES AND REGULATIONS
WORK, LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT -see also- COL BARG; HOLIDAY; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 15-142 )
Labor and Employment
( 8.5-101 , 8.5-102 , 8.5-103 , 8.5-104 , 8.5-105 , 8.5-106 , 8.5-107 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled
Fiscal Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in WordPerfect 8 Format):
House
Number: 173129/01 (pdf)     Offered on: March 24, 2005   at: 2:34 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 283421/01 (pdf)     Offered on: March 24, 2005   at: 2:28 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 316688/01 (pdf)     Offered on: March 23, 2005   at: 10:23 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 963425/01 (pdf)     Offered on: March 24, 2005   at: 2:39 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Senate
Number: 013226/01 (pdf)     Offered on: April 9, 2005   at: 5:37 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 073223/01 (pdf)     Offered on: April 9, 2005   at: 2:03 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 477272/01 (pdf)     Offered on: April 8, 2005   at: 1:12 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 23, 2005: Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {283421/1 Rejected (48-80)
March 23, 2005: Floor Amendment (McMillan) Rejected (39-90)
March 24, 2005: Third Reading Passed (84-50)
April 8, 2005: Third Reading Passed (84-50)
Senate
April 7, 2005: Floor Amendment (Stoltzfus) {073223/1 Rejected (18-28)
April 7, 2005: Floor Amendment (Stoltzfus) {013226/1 Rejected (20-27)
April 7, 2005: Third Reading Passed (30-17)
Click to return on the top page