Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2010 Regular Session

SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION 5

JOINT RESOLUTION NUMBER: 4 File Code: State Government - General Assembly
Sponsored By:
The President
Entitled:
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations

Synopsis:

Rejecting items included in the Resolution of the General Assembly Compensation Commission dated January 5, 2010, and transmitted to the General Assembly on January 12, 2010, that address proposed changes to salaries, in-district travel, out-of-state travel, and the Legislative Pension Plan for members of the General Assembly; providing that salaries for the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Delegates, and the members of the General Assembly and that the provisions for out-of-state travel shall remain at 2006 levels; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/1
First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/2
Hearing 2/5 at 10:00 a.m.
2/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2/12
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Harris) Adopted
2/15
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 2/17 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
2/17
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Adopted
Motion Special Order 2/18 (Senator Harris) Rejected (14-32)
Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Rejected (15-31)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/19
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/8
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (31-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
2/22
First Reading Appropriations
4/5
Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/5
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/20
Signed by the President and the Speaker
- Joint Resolution 4

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Armed Forces -see also- Militia; Veterans
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee.
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Joint Resolution
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 769334/01     Offered on: February 17, 2010   at: 10:32 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 793126/01     Offered on: February 17, 2010   at: 10:47 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 973327/01     Offered on: February 17, 2010   at: 10:32 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 854361/02     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 4:29 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Budget and Taxation
House
Appropriations
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
February 17, 2010: Motion Special Order until 2/18 (Harris) Rejected (14-32)
February 17, 2010: Floor Amendment (Harris) {793126/1 Rejected (15-31)
February 19, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 8, 2010: Third Reading Passed (31-0)
House
April 5, 2010: Third Reading Passed (141-0)