Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 450

File Code: Insurance - Health Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 514
Sponsored By:
Delegates Hubbard and Hammen
Entitled:
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Health Care Reform - Implementation

Synopsis:

Authorizing the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission to provide specified assistance to community health resources in preparing to implement specified health care reform; authorizing the Commission to examine specified issues and potential challenges for community health resources in preparing to implement specified health care reform; requiring the Commission to make recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2012; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/4
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/9
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/4
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
4/7
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/7
First Reading Finance
3/16
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 243

Sponsored by:

Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Facilities and Services
Federal Government
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Patients
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Reports
Telecommunications -see also- Telephones

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 19-2101 , 19-2107 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 206185/01     Offered on: March 2, 2011   at: 10:22 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 547873/01     Offered on: April 5, 2011   at: 10:42 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 2, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Click to return on the top page