Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 460

File Code: Public Health Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 770
Sponsored By:
Delegates Murphy, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, Hammen, Hubbard, Kach, Kipke, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, V. Turner, Rudolph, and Valderrama
Entitled:
Prescription Drug Repository Program - Disposal of Prescription Drugs and Medical Supplies

Synopsis:

Altering the purpose of the Prescription Drug Repository Program to include disposal of prescription drugs and medical supplies; altering the definition of "repository" to include a licensed pharmacy approved by the State Board of Pharmacy to dispose of prescription drugs and medical supplies; altering a specified requirement relating to disposal of prescription drugs and medical supplies by a repository; prohibiting the Program from requiring a private entity to establish, operate, or fund a drop-off site or disposal program; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/7
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/11
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/9
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/11
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
4/8
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/14
First Reading Finance & Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/16
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 547

Sponsored by:

Delegate Peter Murphy, District 28
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate William J. Frank, District 42
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Justin Ready, District 5A
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate David D. Rudolph, District 34B
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Kriselda Valderrama, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Discipline
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health -see also- Mental Health
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 15-601 , 15-602 , 15-605 , 15-605 , 15-605 , 15-607 , 15-608 )
Health Occupations
( 12-313 , 12-313 , 12-313 , 12-403 , 12-403 , 12-403 , 12-403 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 956783/01     Offered on: March 9, 2011   at: 10:46 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 807379/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 1:16 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 11, 2011: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
April 8, 2011: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Senate
April 6, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Click to return on the top page