Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1182

File Code: Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Sponsored By:
Delegates Pendergrass, Bromwell, Cullison, Donoghue, Kach, Pena-Melnyk, and Reznik
Entitled:
Certificates of Need - Percutaneous Coronary Intervention Services

Synopsis:

Prohibiting a hospital from establishing a non-primary percutaneous coronary intervention (PCI) program or providing non-primary PCI services, unless the hospital was operating a PCI program on January 1, 2011, through a certificate of need or a waiver; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop and report recommendations for statutory changes relating to PCI services; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/16
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/28
Re-referred Health and Government Operations
3/2
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/25
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
4/8
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Delegates Pendergrass, Bromwell, and Kach
4/9
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Finance
3/29
Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
4/8
Motion Recede (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Withdrawn
Senate Recede
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 616

Sponsored by:

Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Care Commission
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Reports
Sunset

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 976983/01     Offered on: March 25, 2011   at: 11:49 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 417477/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 11:51 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 25, 2011: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Senate
April 6, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 8, 2011: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Click to return on the top page