Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes Text

Article - State Personnel and Pensions




§25–401.

    (a)    A member may retire with a normal service retirement allowance if:

        (1)    on or before the date of retirement, the member:

            (i)    has at least 20 years of eligibility service;

            (ii)    1.    is a correctional case management specialist, supervisor, or manager on or before June 30, 2016;

                2.    is vested in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System; and

                3.    has a combined total of at least 20 years of eligibility service from:

                A.    the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System and the Employees’ Retirement System; or

                B.    the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System and the Employees’ Pension System;

            (iii)    1.    is serving in a position specified in:

                A.    § 25–201(a)(8) or (9) of this title on or before June 30, 2017; or

                B.    § 25–201(a)(10) or (11) of this title on or before June 30, 2018;

                2.    is vested in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System; and

                3.    has a combined total of at least 20 years of eligibility service from:

                A.    the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System and the Employees’ Retirement System; or

                B.    the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System and the Employees’ Pension System; or

            (iv)    is at least 55 years old and has:

                1.    at least 5 years of eligibility service credit, if the member is a member on or before June 30, 2011; or

                2.    at least 10 years of eligibility service credit, if the member becomes a member on or after July 1, 2011; and

        (2)    the member completes and submits a written application to the Board of Trustees stating the date when the member desires to retire.

    (b)    (1)    Except as provided in paragraph (2) of this subsection, on retirement under this section, a member is entitled to receive a normal service retirement allowance that equals one fifty–fifth of the member’s average final compensation multiplied by the number of years of creditable service.

        (2)    On retirement under this section, if a member’s annuity is greater than the member’s normal service retirement allowance calculated under paragraph (1) of this subsection, the member’s normal service retirement allowance shall equal the member’s annuity.

    (c)    (1)    This subsection applies only to:

            (i)    a correctional case management specialist, supervisor, or manager who has a combined total of 20 years of eligibility service as provided in subsection (a)(1)(ii) of this section; or

            (ii)    a member serving in a position specified in § 25–201(a)(8), (9), (10), or (11) of this title who has a combined total of 20 years of eligibility service as provided in subsection (a)(1)(iii) of this section.

        (2)    A member is entitled to receive a normal service retirement allowance that equals an allowance based on the creditable service the member has in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System.



Click to return on the top page