Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain union dues paid during the taxable year; prohibiting the subtraction allowed under the Act from exceeding $250 for any taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0172 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/16/2022
Legislative Date
11/16/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Rose) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {673125/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-96)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {553429/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (39-95)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-35)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/16/2022 11/16/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
House 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {563422/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Rose) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Floor Amendment {673125/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-96) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Floor Amendment {553429/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (39-95) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
House 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Third Reading Passed (101-35) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2023 3/23/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 3:24 PM
Click to return on the top page