Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Christopher’s Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person charged with reckless or negligent driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine if the reckless or negligent driving contributed to an accident that resulted in the death of another person.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0025
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0668 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2021
Legislative Date
10/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2021 10/21/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Christopher’s Law)
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 5:05 PM
Click to return on the top page