Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to post on its website a free online course on the identification, prevention, and reporting of child abuse.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0460 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
(   5-716 )
Last Updated: 4/20/2021 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page