Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the expiration date that is required to be included, except under certain circumstances, on labels on drugs and devices dispensed in the manufacturer's original packaging by a pharmacist to the expiration date set by the manufacturer or a shorter period determined by the pharmacist.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {676080/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {676080/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Finance 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Returned Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 10:58 AM
Click to return on the top page