Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State or any local jurisdiction from entering into agreements facilitating immigration-related detention by private entities; prohibiting governmental entities from approving zoning variances or permits for the construction or reuse of buildings to house immigration-related detainees without public notification; requiring governmental entities to terminate existing contracts for the detention of immigration-related detainees by October 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0478
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412715/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {593026/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (45-88)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {923522/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (43-90)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {213227/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (44-89)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {153726/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (45-86)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {123523/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (44-88)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-44)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {412715/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {593026/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (45-88) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {923522/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (43-90) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {213227/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (44-89) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {153726/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (45-86) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {123523/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (44-88) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (86-44) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page