Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Action – Right to Counsel
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Rosenberg, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain individuals have a right to legal representation in eviction proceedings; establishing the Right to Counsel in Evictions Coordinator to organize and direct services and resources to provide covered individuals with legal representation for a judicial or administrative proceeding; providing for the legal representation of certain individuals in certain proceedings and civil matters by certain organizations; providing for outreach and education regarding tenants' rights by certain community groups; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0154
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Action – Right to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Action – Right to Counsel
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/19/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page