Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Right to Counsel
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Rosenberg, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-15)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain individuals have a right to legal representation in eviction proceedings; establishing the Right to Counsel in Evictions Program to be administered by the Maryland Legal Service Corporation to organize and direct services and resources to provide covered individuals with certain legal representation; establishing the Right to Counsel in Evictions Task Force to evaluate the services provided by the Program and provide recommendations on necessary policy and statutory changes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0154
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Action – Right to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {462517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {403922/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (35-88)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {393322/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (44-88)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {883227/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-86)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Right to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Action – Right to Counsel
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {462517/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {403922/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (35-88) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {393322/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (44-88) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {883227/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-86) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Right to Counsel
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {878471/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page