Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the method of calculating a certain reduction in the State agricultural land transfer tax for an instrument of writing that transfers title to agricultural land on which property tax was paid on the basis of an assessment other than farm or agricultural use in certain years before the transfer; exempting an instrument of writing from the agricultural land transfer tax if the instrument of writing transfers title to agricultural land that was previously transferred by a certain instrument of writing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0344
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2018
Legislative Date
10/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {315066/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2018 10/02/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Nonagricultural Use Exemption - Repeal
House 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {315066/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Text - Chapter - State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
(   13-301, 13-302, 13-303, 13-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page