Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rehabilitation and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to set certain goals for the number of inmates in rehabilitation programs and establish certain tracking systems; requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Human Services to assist the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services in establishing certain tracking systems; and requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to assist inmates in accessing federal Pell Grants.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1334 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Rehabilitation and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Rehabilitation and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-701 through 2-703 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page