Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Maryland Department of Labor to oversee the licensing of community managers who provide management services for common ownership communities; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not prohibit certain persons from providing certain services under certain circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0367 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/29/2021
Legislative Date
9/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/29/2021 9/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   22-101 through 22-802 )
(   2-106.15, 2-106.16, 2-108   )
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page