Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Clark
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting certain activities and the use of certain equipment that is associated with a shellfish nursery operation from the requirement to obtain certain licenses or permits; establishing that the use of certain equipment associated with a shellfish nursery operation is not included as a nonwater-dependent project for the purposes of obtaining a tidal or State wetlands license; providing that the installation of certain equipment for the cultivation of shellfish seed under a certain permit is a lawful use on private wetlands; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0939
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2018
Legislative Date
10/24/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {760211/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2018 10/24/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {760211/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
(   16-101, 16-104, 16-202, 16-304 )
(   4-11A-23 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page