Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying - Inquiry by Intake Officer
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a Department of Juvenile Services intake officer to forward a complaint that alleges a violation involving the misuse of electronic communication or interactive computer service and a related case file to the State's Attorney under certain circumstances.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0403 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2023
Legislative Date
10/16/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2023 10/16/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying - Inquiry by Intake Officer
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/9/2024 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page