Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council is in the Office of Resilience in the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; and altering the process for electing a cochair of the Council.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0124
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2022
Legislative Date
10/31/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2022 10/31/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/1/2023 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page