Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain quantity threshold and establishing a certain age limit applicable to a certain civil offense of use or possession of cannabis; establishing a civil offense for use or possession of a certain amount of cannabis for a person of at least a certain age; establishing a civil offense for cultivating cannabis plants in a certain manner; providing for the licensing of cannabis establishments; establishing certain duties of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission regarding the licensing of cannabis establishments; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
(   10-105.1, 10-105.2 )
(   23-101 through 23-702 )
(   12.5-101 through 12.5-104 )
Last Updated: 2/15/2021 12:16 PM
Click to return on the top page