Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Controlled Dangerous Substances – Schedules – Adjustment
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain lists of substances designated as controlled dangerous substances under certain schedules under the Maryland Controlled Substances Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0614
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Controlled Dangerous Substances – Schedules – Adjustment
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Controlled Dangerous Substances – Schedules – Adjustment
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Controlled Dangerous Substances – Schedules – Adjustment
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page