Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Resale of Lot - Inspection Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a homeowners association to charge a reasonable fee not to exceed $50 for an inspection of a lot owner's lot if the inspection is required by the governing documents of the homeowners association.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540111/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-44)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Resale of Lot - Inspection Fees
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {540111/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (85-44) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Resale of Lot - Inspection Fees
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {688479/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Resale of Lot - Inspection Fees
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Resale of Lot - Inspection Fees
(   11B-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page