Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to authorize a certain health care practitioner at an approved school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth under certain circumstances; prohibiting the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health from establishing certain requirements for a certain school-based health center to provide health care services through telehealth; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0278
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Cox) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {633627/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (39-93)
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text - First - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Cox) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Floor Amendment {633627/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (39-93) 22AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed 22AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:42 PM
Click to return on the top page