Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public adjuster, or anyone acting on behalf of a public adjuster, from soliciting or attempting to solicit a client between the hours of 8:00 p.m. and 8:00 a.m.; altering the statements that are required to be included in a public adjuster contract; altering a certain rescission period for public adjuster contracts; and requiring a public adjuster to provide notice to the Commissioner, in a form and manner the Commissioner determines, within 1 business day after the public adjuster has entered into a contract.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0231
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2023
Legislative Date
9/15/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2023 9/15/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
House 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {843825/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {983424/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:49 AM
Click to return on the top page