Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 58
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain limitation on the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law to the construction of any public work for which 25%, rather than 50%, or more of the money used for construction is State money; altering the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law to public work contracts by reducing the contract threshold amount from $500,000 to $250,000; and applying the Act only to a public work contract executed on or after October 1, 2021.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0035
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Overridden (32-15)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723993/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {567079/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Overridden (96-41)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2021) - Chapter 58
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Overridden (32-15) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {723993/1 Adopted 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Finance 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {567079/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-40) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Post Passage 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Overridden (96-41) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2021) - Chapter 58
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page