Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making certain telephone solicitations to a certain called party in a certain manner by restricting the methods, times, and identifying information that the person making the call may utilize; providing that the Act does not apply to certain entities and circumstances; and making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice that is subject to enforcement and penalties under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/04/2022
Legislative Date
11/04/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/04/2022 11/04/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
House 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments {363820/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Finance 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments {893826/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-301,   14-4501 through 14-4504 )
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 12:34 PM
Click to return on the top page