Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State; providing the Act does not apply to an employment contract or a similar document or agreement with respect to the taking or use of a client list or other proprietary client-related information; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0328
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0506 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/02/2018
Legislative Date
11/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553899/1
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {533027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Charkoudian and Wilson)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/02/2018 11/02/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {553899/1 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Motion Special Order until 02/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {247176/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {533027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Charkoudian and Wilson) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page