Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to waive a certain publication requirement in an action for change of name under the Maryland Rules on motion by an individual who has filed the action.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page