Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a fee of $14 to be collected once every 2 years on each motor vehicle registered in the State that is granted a waiver from, exempted from, or not subject to the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program; and requiring the fee to be deposited in the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and be used to incentivize and purchase electric vehicles and expand electric vehicle infrastructure.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0104
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/23/2022 5:05 PM
Click to return on the top page