Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Collaborative Care Pilot Program; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to expand access to and provide reimbursement for services provided in accordance with the Collaborative Care Model under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0101
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2023
Legislative Date
1/22/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-6)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion
House 1/22/2023 1/22/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Third Reading Passed (126-6) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 8:30 AM
Click to return on the top page