Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees - Parental Bereavement Leave
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain State employees are entitled to use up to 10 days of parental bereavement leave with pay within 60 days after the death of the employee's child; providing that certain state employees are entitled to use up to 60 days of parental bereavement leave within 60 days after the employee experiences a stillbirth or the death of the employee's infant; and prohibiting certain State entities from requiring State employees entitled to parental bereavement leave under the Act to use any other paid leave available to the employee.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0109
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2023
Legislative Date
10/02/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Employees - Parental Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Employees - Parental Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2023 10/02/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Employees - Parental Bereavement Leave
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments {513025/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Employees - Parental Bereavement Leave
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2024 2/11/2024 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page