Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "ignition interlock system" to require that an ignition interlock system be equipped with a camera capable of recording still images of the person taking the test of the person's blood alcohol level; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {422711/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
House 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {422711/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
(   21-902.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page