Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment; and requiring, on or before July 1, 2023 and December 1, 2023, the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, and the General Assembly.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0377 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/31/2022 12:14 PM
Click to return on the top page