Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
Sponsored by
Delegate Mangione
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Designating motor vehicle theft as a certain crime of violence.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2023
Legislative Date
8/28/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2023 8/28/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page