Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Boyce, Bridges, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harrison, Lehman, Stewart, and Wells
Status
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a train or light engine used in the movement of freight in the same rail corridor as a high-speed passenger or commuter train from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing certain penalties; providing that a railroad company is solely responsible for certain actions of its agents or employees; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures; requiring certain notice be made to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0252
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0180 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-30)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {443128/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {180712/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (102-30) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Floor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Floor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {443128/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page