Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2022, a food service business from providing certain single-use food or beverage products to a certain customer unless requested by the customer; requiring a food service business to maintain a limited supply of certain single-use food and beverage products for certain customers; prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2024, an owner, an operator, or a manager of a lodging establishment with 51 or more rooms from providing certain personal cleansing products in small plastic bottles; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   9-2001,   9-2101,   9-2105,   9-2108 through 9-2110, 9-2113 through 9-2116 )
Last Updated: 7/26/2021 6:56 AM
Click to return on the top page